THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:04:45 AM
Klein, David
CPSO#:
99666
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saint James School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Atkinson Medical Centre
531 Atkinson Ave
Unit 17
Thornhill ON L4J 8L7
Phone: (905) 731-5554
Fax: (905) 709-7722
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2012 to 06 Feb 2013
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Aug 2013
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |