THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:30:46 AM
Bella-Lufu, Mbuyamba
CPSO#:
99631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universit' de Kinshasa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
14-1884 Merivale Rd
Ottawa ON K2G 1E6
Phone: 613-737-0888
Fax: 613-737-0222
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MBUYAMBA BELLA-LUFU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLA-LUFU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 31, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)