THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:17:19 PM
Snelgrove, Ryan Carl
CPSO#:
99600
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Colorectal Surgery |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |