THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:38:55 PM
Kisselgoff, Olga Aleksandrovna
CPSO#:
99590
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Science Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 6846001
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLGA ALEKSANDROVNA KISSELGOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISSELGOFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 12 Nov 2012 to 03 Feb 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 18 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2015 |