THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:07:26 PM
Patgunarajah, Anushi
CPSO#:
99573
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Braydon Blvd
Brampton ON L6P 2S4
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2021 |
|
Active |