THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:29:49 AM
Mir, Kamran
CPSO#:
99562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Rd
Milton ON L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:15 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAMRAN MIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2013 |