THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:45:41 AM
Neuendorff-el Helou, Luise
CPSO#:
99339
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 323 6400
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:11 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUISE NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 09 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 11 Apr 2019 to 19 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 21 Sep 2021
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Apr 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2020 |