THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:12:34 PM
Sandhu, Janmeet
CPSO#:
99128
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Sardar Patel Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-8404
Fax: (416) 244-0310
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
|
Active |