THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:48:18 AM
Downes, Michelle Rose
CPSO#:
98940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E 400
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87597
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:02 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Apr 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |
|
Active |