THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:49:10 AM
Parotto, Matteo
CPSO#:
98850
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Padova, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Management
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3-442
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Apr 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 31 Mar 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2021 |
|
Active |