THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:07:31 AM
Ocampo, Vanessa
CPSO#:
98805
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Libre de Colombia, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Rd E
One Health
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-2900
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:03 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VANESSA OCAMPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OCAMPO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 02 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 02 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Feb 2020
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2018 |