THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:04:56 AM
Lockey, Andrew James
CPSO#:
98567
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Limerick School of Medicin, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Lockey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 29 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Neurology
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |