THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:40:23 AM
Watts, Maria del Pilar
CPSO#:
98561
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Chacon, Maria del Pilar (used until: 20 Dec 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Centre
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA DEL PILAR WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 05 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 05 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2019 |