THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:39:27 AM
Rushton, Moira Katherine
CPSO#:
98540
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rushton, Moira Katherine (used until: 08 Mar 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-7700
Fax: 613-247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Dec 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOIRA KATHERINE RUSHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSHTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2017 |