THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:56:03 AM
Dashti, Behnoosh
CPSO#:
98430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
140 Academy St
AR Gould Hospital
Women's Health Clinic
Presque Isle ME 04769-3171
United States
Phone: 2077684000
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEHNOOSH DASHTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASHTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 11 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 11 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 11 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2016 |