THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:40:16 AM
Rodelo Ceballos, Karoll Alexandra
CPSO#:
98416
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad De Cartagena, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2018 |