THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:49:44 PM
Naeem, Omer
CPSO#:
98397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
189 Hughson Street South
Hamilton ON L8N 2B6
Phone: 905-802-6791
Fax: 289-919-2510
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:31 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMER NAEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Neurology
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 31 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2017 |