THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:07:20 AM
White, Alexander Nicholas Joseph
CPSO#:
98391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street, 3EN-464
Toronto ON
Toronto ON M5G2C4
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER NICHOLAS JOSEPH WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2022 |