THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:51:50 PM
Suleman, Shazeen
CPSO#:
98384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
2Nd Floor
61 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Suleman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAZEEN SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2016 |