THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:56:20 PM
Hulme, Jennifer Meghan
CPSO#:
98363
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3856
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MEGHAN HULME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HULME is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2015 |