THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:43:37 AM
Rao, Adarsh Sathish
CPSO#:
98331
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
755 Queensway E
Suite 304
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Phone: (905) 826-4048
Fax: (905) 826-7201
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:03 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADARSH SATHISH RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2020 |