THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:17:10 AM
Kucheran, Jacob Nicholas
CPSO#:
98287
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
25 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2017 |