THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:02:48 AM
Sanci, Vito
CPSO#:
98246
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Medical Staff Office
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON L4R 4P4
CANADA
Phone: 705-526-1300
Fax: 705-527-4563
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VITO SANCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANCI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 25 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2018 |