THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:01:51 PM
Silverberg, Rory Michael William
CPSO#:
98223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
308-1265 Arthur St E
Thunder Bay ON P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-5452
Fax: (807) 622-5710
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RORY MICHAEL WILLIAM SILVERBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2017 |