THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:33:39 AM
Pelc, Jordan Ryan
CPSO#:
98182
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON M4M 2B5
Phone: 4164618252
Fax: 4164706720
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Pelc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JORDAN RYAN PELC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2014 |