THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:06:47 AM
McLean, Kristopher William
CPSO#:
98175
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTOPHER WILLIAM MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |