THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:49:11 AM
Moores, Andrew Roderick
CPSO#:
98126
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
550 University Ave
Toronto Rehab Institute
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: 4165973422
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW RODERICK MOORES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 17 Aug 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2015 |