THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:54:58 PM
Crawford, Eric John
CPSO#:
98102
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
MG 317
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:03 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC JOHN CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2022 |