THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:39:02 AM
Baribeau, Danielle Andrea
CPSO#:
98101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
150 Kilgour Rd
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitati
East York ON M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 3586
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital |
Toronto |
The Hospital for Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE ANDREA BARIBEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARIBEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2019 |