THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:51:56 AM
Mitchell, Michael Andrew
CPSO#:
98055
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
E6-202
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519)667-6756
Fax: (519)667-6597
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:06 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Nov 2018
CF - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2016 |