THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:15:09 AM
Symonette, Caitlin Jane
CPSO#:
98025
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC- Victoria Campus
E2-631
800 Commissioners Road E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 76757
Fax: 519-667-6761
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAITLIN JANE SYMONETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYMONETTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2019 |