THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 15:19:18 PM
Stall, Nathan Morton
CPSO#:
98019
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 586-4800 Ext. 7856
Fax: 416 586-5113
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHAN MORTON STALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |