THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:45:51 PM
Poushay, Heather Marie
CPSO#:
97966
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 May 2021 |