THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:36:44 AM
Wykes, Benjamin Cain
CPSO#:
97962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 14, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 14, 2022, Lake of the Woods District Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act), that the hospital imposed restrictions on Dr. Wykes’ hospital privileges effective July 9, 2022.
On March 13, 2023, Lake of the Woods District Hospital (LWDH) notified the College that following recommendation from the LWDH Medical Advisory Committee (MAC), Dr. Wykes' Application 2023 was being refused/denied and that his privileges at LWDH were being revoked, effective March 9, 2023.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:31 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN CAIN WYKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYKES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2018 |