THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:06:01 PM
McFaul, Colleen Margaret
CPSO#:
97927
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Daly, Colleen Margaret (used until: 11 Sep 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613737-8187
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLLEEN MARGARET MCFAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFAUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2018 |