THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:49:52 PM
Andrews, Jessica Lynn
CPSO#:
97924
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tweedle, Jessica Lynn (used until: 08 Oct 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee, ON K7R 2Z4
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301 Ext. 444
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA LYNN ANDREWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |