THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:19:10 PM
Torne-Perez, Montserrat
CPSO#:
97909
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
WRH Western Campus
Dept of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:01 Jul 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2013 |
|
Active |