THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:21:05 PM
Colter, Ashley Lind
CPSO#:
97899
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Colter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY LIND COLTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Dec 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2015 |