THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:03:05 AM
Ivory, Catherine Paulette Alice
CPSO#:
97892
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Department of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Dr, Box 37
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81840
Fax: 613-738-8336
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:14 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE PAULETTE ALICE IVORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVORY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2017 |