THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:56:34 PM
Lim, Solina Sun Kyung
CPSO#:
97886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Yoo, Solina Sun Kyung (used until: 15 Aug 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6A 2Z1
Phone: (416) 7852500 Ext. 2488
Fax: (416) 7852409
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Solina Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOLINA SUN KYUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2016 |