THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:58:51 PM
Lim Fat, Mary Jane Li-Chin
CPSO#:
97884
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY JANE LI-CHIN LIM FAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM FAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2020 |