THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:10:59 PM
Dhaliwal, Shelinderjit
CPSO#:
97857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjabi University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Oakville Traflgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4900
Fax: 9058155076
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Dec 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHELINDERJIT DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 17 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2017 |