THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:41:11 AM
Raghavan, Gita
CPSO#:
97841
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GITA RAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Dec 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |