THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:09:47 AM
Ashton, Rosalind Julia Clare
CPSO#:
97786
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304-168 Charlotte Street
Ridea-MD
Ottawa ON K1N 8K6
Phone: 613 688 7707
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSALIND JULIA CLARE ASHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 08 Mar 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Mar 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2021 |