THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:13:32 AM
Spelliscy, Courtney Chloe Dunlop
CPSO#:
97763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:21 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COURTNEY CHLOE DUNLOP SPELLISCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPELLISCY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |