THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:29:06 AM
Cochrane, Colin Tadashi
CPSO#:
97751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2-2054 Horseshoe Valley Rd W
Barrie ON L4M 4Y8
Phone: 7057331151
Fax: 7057217915
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLIN TADASHI COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2015 |