THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:17:55 PM
Tawfic Hamodi, Qutaiba Amir
CPSO#:
97749
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Al-Nahrain University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 6858500 Ext. 61786
Fax: (519) 646-6219
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iraq
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:13 Oct 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jun 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |