THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:27:55 PM
Fung, Filgen Yut-Tou
CPSO#:
97732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
2nd Floor, Room 252
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76993
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:01 Nov 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FILGEN YUT-TOU FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2016 to 01 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 02 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 02 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 01 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 02 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 01 Nov 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 02 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 01 Nov 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Oct 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2020 |