THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:49:24 PM
Jaswal, Gurpreet
CPSO#:
97725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
General Internal Medicine
1245 Lakeshore Road
1N 600 North Tower
Burlington ON L7S0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 4110
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GURPREET JASWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 14 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |