THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:36:00 PM
Belley-Cote, Emilie-Prudence
CPSO#:
97709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 40741
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILIE-PRUDENCE BELLEY-COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLEY-COTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 9 - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2012 |